EP2741105 - Vehicle body part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2019 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Exteriors (Germany) GmbH Industriestraße 66280 Sulzbach / DE | [2017/13] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Decoma (Germany) GmbH Justus-von-Liebig-Strasse 5 66280 Sulzbach / Saar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swoboda, Torsten Am Raigerwald 43 72622 Nürtingen / DE | 02 /
Götzelmann, Johannes Am Trieb 9 97237 Altertheim / DE | 03 /
Sailer, Gottfried Miedelsbacher Straße 2 D-73614 Schorndorf / DE | [2014/24] | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele Magna International (Germany) GmbH Kurfürst-Eppstein-Ring 11 63877 Sailauf / DE | [2014/24] | Application number, filing date | 13193168.5 | 15.11.2013 | [2014/24] | Priority number, date | DE201210222557 | 07.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012222557 | DE201310200364 | 14.01.2013 Original published format: DE102013200364 | [2014/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2741105 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2741105 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/93 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
G01S13/931 (EP);
G01S7/03 (EP);
G01S2013/93275 (EP);
G01S7/027 (EP);
G01S7/4043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Karosserieteil | [2014/24] | English: | Vehicle body part | [2014/24] | French: | Pièce de carrosserie | [2014/24] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/16] | 13.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.03.2019 | 26.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE10149337 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1,4,6,7 * paragraph [0021]; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE10156699 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 5,13-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]EP1646266 (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12,13,16 * the whole document * [Y] 5,13-15 [I] 11; | [XD]DE102011107216 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [XD] 1-3,6-8,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10314862 | DE102011107216 |