EP2732707 - Method of producing a composition containing caseinomacropeptide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arla Foods Amba Sonderhoj 14 8260 Viby J / DK | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTENSEN, Jesper Ørnsøvej 22, 1. 8600 Silkeborg / DK | 02 /
HOLST, Hans Henrik Rosenallé 86 6920 Videbæk / DK | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2015/45] |
Former [2014/21] | Østergaard, Steen Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Application number, filing date | 13193171.9 | 15.11.2013 | [2014/21] | Priority number, date | US201261726724P | 15.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261726724 P | EP20120192731 | 15.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12192731 | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732707 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2732707 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23C21/00, A23J1/20, A23J3/10 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
A23C9/1425 (EP,US);
A23C21/00 (EP,US);
A23J1/20 (EP,US);
A23J1/205 (EP,US);
A23J3/10 (US);
A23L33/19 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/54246, A23V2250/55, A23V2300/30, A23V2300/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2014/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 06.11.2014 | ME | 06.11.2014 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Komposition mit Caseinomakropeptid | [2014/21] | English: | Method of producing a composition containing caseinomacropeptide | [2014/21] | French: | Procédé de production d'une composition contenant du caseinomacropeptide | [2014/21] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 28.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.08.2016
09.08.2016
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Schrell, Andreas Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/37] | 13.09.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.01.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.03.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/34] | 16.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.04.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.04.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2013 | AL | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | HR | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | MK | 04.11.2015 | MT | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | RS | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | SM | 04.11.2015 | LU | 15.11.2015 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 15.11.2013 | |
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 15.11.2013 | |
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
LU | 15.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 15.11.2013 | |
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 04.11.2015 | |
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | HR | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | HR | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 04.11.2015 | |
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 04.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012012237 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 15* the whole document *; | [X] - Yue Xu ET AL, "Separation of bovine immunoglobulin G and glycomacropeptide from dairy whey", (20000101), pages 393 - 399, URL: http://ac.els-cdn.com/S0032959200001990/1-s2.0-S0032959200001990-main.pdf?_tid=d7b13fec-da4a-11e2-884c-00000aacb35d&acdnat=1371802755_4740597dea73dfc498108887d75787e1, (20130621), XP055067687 [X] 15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-9592(00)00199-0 | [XD] - THOMA C ET AL, "Precipitation behaviour of caseinomacropeptides and their simultaneous determination with whey proteins by RP-HPLC", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE, BARKING, GB, vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.IDAIRYJ.2005.05.003, ISSN 0958-6946, (20060401), pages 285 - 293, (20060401), XP024963379 [XD] 15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.idairyj.2005.05.003 | [XI] - LACLAIR CAITLIN E ET AL, "Purification and Use of Glycomacropeptide for Nutritional Management of Phenylketonuria", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, INC, US, vol. 74, no. 4, doi:10.1111/J.1750-3841.2009.01134.X, ISSN 0022-1147, (20090501), pages E199 - E206, (20090414), XP009138545 [X] 15 * the whole document * [I] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1750-3841.2009.01134.x | by applicant | US5278288 | WO9814071 | WO9918808 | EP1037537 | - THOMÄ, C; KRAUSE, I; KULOZIK, U, "Precipitation behaviour of caseinomacropeptides and their simultaneous determination with whey proteins by RP-HPLC", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL, (2006), vol. 16, pages 285 - 293 | Opposition | WO8904608 | US5075424 | US5278288 | WO9814071 | US2002183489 | WO2010144821 | - BRODY, E.P., "Biological activities of bovine glycomacropeptide", British Journal of Nutrition, (20000000), vol. 84, no. Suppl. 1, pages S39 - S46, XP009077372 | - LI et al., "Technical Note: Comparison of Chromatographic Profile of Gly- comacropeptide from Cheese Whey Isolated Using Different Methods", Journal of Dairy Science, (20040000), vol. 87, pages 174 - 177, XP055308046 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(04)73155-0 | - LAHOUL, M., Tech Brief: Membrane Filtration, (19990300), pages 1 - 8, XP055308047 | - LACLAIR et al., "Purification and Use of Glycomacropeptide for Nutritional Manage ment of Phenylketonuria", Journal of Food Science, (20090000), vol. 74, no. 4, pages 199 - 206, XP055308049 |