EP2732743 - Drawer-shaped reservoir for collecting spent coffee grounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Bastos Almeida, Artur 13, Rue des Tondeurs 9570 Wiltz / LU | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 13193306.1 | 18.11.2013 | [2014/21] | Priority number, date | LU20120092097 | 16.11.2012 Original published format: LU 92097 | [2014/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2732743 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2732743 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/60, A47J31/44 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
A47J31/44 (EP);
A47J31/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2014/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schuhbladenförmiger Behälter zum Aufnehmen des Kaffeesatzes | [2014/21] | English: | Drawer-shaped reservoir for collecting spent coffee grounds | [2014/21] | French: | Réservoir à tiroir cylindrique pour collecter des restes de café en chute | [2014/21] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 07.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2013 | AL | 23.09.2015 | AT | 23.09.2015 | BG | 23.09.2015 | CY | 23.09.2015 | CZ | 23.09.2015 | DK | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | ES | 23.09.2015 | FI | 23.09.2015 | HR | 23.09.2015 | IT | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | MK | 23.09.2015 | MT | 23.09.2015 | NL | 23.09.2015 | PL | 23.09.2015 | RO | 23.09.2015 | RS | 23.09.2015 | SE | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | SK | 23.09.2015 | SM | 23.09.2015 | TR | 23.09.2015 | IE | 18.11.2015 | LU | 18.11.2015 | BE | 30.11.2015 | NO | 23.12.2015 | GR | 24.12.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | [2018/48] |
Former [2018/47] | HU | 18.11.2013 | |
AL | 23.09.2015 | ||
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/45] | HU | 18.11.2013 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.11.2013 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 18.11.2013 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 23.09.2015 | |
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1408651 (MIDI CAOUTCHOUC SA) [A] 1-9 * page 1; figure - *; | [A]DE29808159U (VON CARNAP PETER [DE]) [A] 1-9 * pages 1,2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2005152283 (SUKEETAA KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [AD]EP1803380 (DA SILVA PINTO FERREIRA MANUEL [PT], et al) [AD] 8,9* paragraphs [0006] - [0011]; figure - * | by applicant | GB812833 | FR2225126 | EP1803380 | WO2009127983 | WO2012107246 |