EP2874039 - Control method for a heat transfer system and heat transfer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grundfos Holding A/S Poul Due Jensens Vej 7-11 8850 Bjerringbro / DK | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kallesøe, Carsten Skovmose Langvadhøj 25 8800 Viborg / DK | 02 /
Nielsen, Brian Kongsgaard Kildevænget 41 8800 Viborg / DK | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Patentanwälte Vollmann & Hemmer Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 13193555.3 | 19.11.2013 | [2015/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2874039 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2874039 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, G05D23/13, F24D19/10, F24F11/00 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
G05D23/1393 (EP,US);
F24D19/10 (RU);
F28F27/02 (US);
F24D5/04 (US);
F24F11/00 (RU);
F24F11/63 (EP,RU,US);
F24F11/84 (EP,RU,US);
F24F11/85 (EP,RU,US);
F24F11/88 (EP,RU,US);
F24F3/08 (US);
G05D23/00 (RU);
G05D23/1919 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2015/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Steuerverfahren für ein Wärmeübertragungssystem sowie ein solches Wärmeübertragungssystem | [2015/21] | English: | Control method for a heat transfer system and heat transfer system | [2015/21] | French: | Procédé de commande pour un système de transmission de chaleur et système de transmission de chaleur de ce type | [2015/21] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 14.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2013 | AL | 29.03.2017 | CY | 29.03.2017 | CZ | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | ES | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | HR | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | MK | 29.03.2017 | MT | 29.03.2017 | NL | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | RS | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | SM | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | NO | 29.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | IE | 19.11.2017 | LU | 19.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.11.2013 | |
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
TR | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.11.2013 | |
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 19.11.2013 | |
CY | 29.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.11.2013 | |
CZ | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.11.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
LU | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
ES | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
NL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2068601 (LANDIS & GYR AG); | [A]EP0197836 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]) |