EP2876124 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING A CRYSTALLISABLE POLYLACTIDE MIXTURE AND POLYLACTIDE MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/22] | Method and apparatus for manufacturing a crystallisable polylactide mixture and polylactide mixture | ||
[2018/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uhde Inventa-Fischer GmbH Holzhauser Strasse 157-159 13509 Berlin / DE | For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2017/24] |
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states Uhde Inventa-Fischer GmbH Holzhauser Strasse 157-159 13509 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states ThyssenKrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagen, Rainer Stolzingstr. 64 13465 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Mühlbauer, Udo Schwedter Str. 10 10119 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Paetz, Caspar Seestr. 44 13353 Berlin / DE | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2019/02] |
Former [2015/22] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13193671.8 | 20.11.2013 | [2015/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2876124 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2876124 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/08, C08G63/78, C08L67/04 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
C08L67/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/08 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/2445 (EP,US);
C08G63/78 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/785 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/90 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08L67/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2015/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KRISTALLISIERBAREN POLYMILCHSÄUREMISCHUNG SOWIE POLYMILCHSÄUREMISCHUNG | [2018/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING A CRYSTALLISABLE POLYLACTIDE MIXTURE AND POLYLACTIDE MIXTURE | [2018/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN MÉLANGE D'ACIDE POLYLACTIQUE ET MÉLANGE D'ACIDE POLYLACTIQUE | [2018/39] |
Former [2015/22] | Verfahren sowie Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer kristallisierbaren Polymilchsäuremischung sowie Polymilchsäurmischung | ||
Former [2015/22] | Method and apparatus for manufacturing a crystallisable polylactide mixture and polylactide mixture | ||
Former [2015/22] | Procédé et dispositif de fabrication d'un mélange d'acide polylactique et mélange d'acide polylactique | Examination procedure | 27.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 19.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2013 | AL | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | HR | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MK | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | PL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | RS | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | SM | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | NO | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 20.11.2013 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 20.11.2013 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9315127 (CARGILL INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * claim 1 *; | [XDA]EP1577346 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC [JP]) [XD] 20-23 * example 5 * * tables 1,2 * * paragraphs [0095] , [0098] , [0102] - [0105] * [A] 1-19; | [A]EP2058351 (TEIJIN ENG [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * claims 1,2,12 ** paragraph [0069] *; | [A]WO2013039266 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * claim - *; | [A]EP2607399 (COMPANHIA REFINADORA DA AMAZONIA [BR]) [A] 1-23 * claim 1 * | by applicant | WO8810260 | US5558678 | WO2005030395 | EP1577346 | WO2009030395 | WO2009030397 | WO2009039397 | EP2161263 | - M. PYDA ET AL., J. CHEM. THERMODYNAMICS, (2004), vol. 36, page 731 | - J. DORGAN ET AL., J. POLYM. SCI.: PART B: POLYM. PHYSICS, (2005), vol. 43, pages 3100 - 3111 |