EP2701131 - Monitoring, predicting and treating clinical episodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Earlysense Ltd. 12, Tzvi Street 52504 Ramat Gan / IL | [2014/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meger, Guy 107 Aba Hilel Silver St. 32697 Haifa / IL | 02 /
Karasik, Roman 5 San Martin St. 71279 Lod / IL | 03 /
Klap, Tal 1/57 Simtat Lotem St. 42493 Netanya / IL | 04 /
Halperin, Avner 29 Kiryati Street 52223 Ramat Gan / IL | 05 /
Averboukh, Arkadi 29 Kiryati Street 52223 Rmat Gan / IL | 06 /
Hoffert, Smadar 24 Yoni Netanyahu St. 54424 Givat Shmuel / IL | 07 /
Marco, Rotem 1/7 Alexander Yanai St. 62382 Tel Aviv / IL | 08 /
Kapon, Shlomi 38 Jabotinsky St. 58293 Holon / IL | 09 /
Levkovich, Shiraz 127 Snir St. 49950 Moshav Nehalim / IL | 10 /
Shinar, Zvi 4 Ha'Haruv St. 30500 Binyamina / IL | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13193683.3 | 10.05.2009 | [2014/09] | Priority number, date | US20080052395P | 12.05.2008 Original published format: US 52395 P | US20080054754P | 20.05.2008 Original published format: US 54754 P | US20080082510P | 22.07.2008 Original published format: US 82510 P | US20080103276P | 07.10.2008 Original published format: US 103276 P | US20080141677P | 31.12.2008 Original published format: US 141677 P | US20090144743P | 15.01.2009 Original published format: US 144743 P | [2014/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2701131 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Classification | IPC: | G08B23/00, G08B21/04, G08B21/22, A61B5/00, A61B5/0205, A61G12/00 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
G08B21/0461 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (EP,US);
A61B5/02405 (EP,US);
A61B5/349 (EP,US);
A61B5/4094 (EP,US);
A61B5/412 (EP,US);
A61B5/447 (EP,US);
A61B5/4818 (EP,US);
A61B5/4839 (EP,US);
A61B5/6887 (EP,US);
A61B5/7203 (EP,US);
G08B21/0453 (EP,US);
G08B21/22 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B5/021 (EP,US);
A61B5/024 (EP,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,US);
A61B5/11 (EP,US);
A61B5/1115 (EP,US);
A61B5/145 (EP,US);
A61B5/14542 (EP,US);
A61B5/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/318 (EP);
A61B5/746 (EP,US);
A61B7/003 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/09] | Title | German: | Überwachung, Prognose und Behandlung von klinischen Episoden | [2014/09] | English: | Monitoring, predicting and treating clinical episodes | [2014/09] | French: | Surveiller, prévoir et traiter des épisodes cliniques | [2014/09] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09746270.9 / EP2286395 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US4657026 | US5235989 | US5540734 | US5743263 | US5957861 | US5964720 | US6134970 | US6375621 | US6383142 | US6436057 | US2003045806 | US6599251 | US6856141 | US2005119586 | WO2005074361 | US6980679 | US6984207 | US6984993 | US7025729 | US2006084848 | US2006241510 | WO2006137067 | WO2007052108 | US2007118054 | US2007156031 | US2007249952 | US7314451 | US2008005838 | US2008275349 | - ALIHANKA J. ET AL., "A new method for long-term monitoring of the ballistocardiogram, heart rate, and respiration", AM J PHYSIOL REGUL INTEGR COMP PHYSIOL, (1981), vol. 240, pages 384 - 392 | - BENTUR, L. ET AL., "Wheeze monitoring in children for assessment of nocturnal asthma and response to therapy", EUR RESPIR J, (2003), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 621 - 626 | - CHANG, A.B. ET AL., "Cough, airway inflammation, and mild asthma exacerbation", ARCHIVES OF DISEASE IN CHILDHOOD, (2002), vol. 86, pages 270 - 275 | - DEMPSTER, A.P.; N.M. LAIRD; D. B. RUBIN, "Maximum likelihood from incomplete data via the EM algorithm", JOURNAL OF THE ROYAL STATISTICAL SOCIETY, (1977), vol. 39, pages 1 - 38 | - HIRTUM, A.; BERCKMANS, D.; DEMUYNCK, K.; COMPERNOLLE, D., "Autoregressive Acoustical Modelling of Free Field Cough Sound", PROC. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, (200205), vol. I, pages 493 - 496 | - HSU, J. Y. ET AL., "Coughing frequency in patients with persistent cough: assessment using a 24 hour ambulatory recorder", EUR RESPIR J, (1994), vol. 7, pages 1246 - 1253 | - HUDGEL, D.W.; R. J. MARTIN; B. JOHNSON; P. HILL, "Mechanics of the respiratory system during sleep in normal humans", J. APPL. PHYSIOL., (1984), vol. 5, pages 133 - 137 | - KANDTELHARDT, J.W.; T. PENZEL; S. ROSTIG; H. F. BECKER; S. HALVIN; A. BUNDE, "Breathing during REM and non-REM sleep: correlated versus uncorrelated behavior", PHYSICA. A., (2003), vol. 319, pages 447 - 457 | - "Mixture density estimation", LI, Q; A. BARRON, Advances in neural information processing systems, MIT PRESS, (2000), vol. 12, pages 279 - 285 | - MACK, D. ET AL., "Non-invasive analysis of physiological signals: NAPS: A low cost, passive monitor for sleep quality and related applications", UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA HEALTH SYSTEM (UNDATED | - O'CONNOR CJ ET AL., "Identification of endotracheal tube malpositions using computerized analysis of breath sounds via electronic stethoscopes", ANESTH ANALG, (2005), vol. 101, pages 735 - 9 | - OPPENHEIM, A.V.; R.W. SCHAFER, Discrete-Time Signal Processing, PRENTICE-HALL, (1989), pages 311 - 312 | - SALMI, T. ET AL., "Automatic analysis of sleep records with static charge sensitive bed", ELECTROENCEPHALOGRAPHY AND CLINICAL NEUROPHYSIOLOGY, (1986), vol. 64, pages 84 - 87 | - "Estimating the dimension of a model", SCHWARZ, G., Annals of statistics, (1978), vol. 6, pages 461 - 464 | - SORVOJA, H; MYLLYLÄ R., "Noninvasive blood pressure measurement methods", MOLECULAR AND QUANTUM ACOUSTICS, (2006), vol. 27 | - WARIS, M. ET AL., "A new method for automatic wheeze detection", TECHNOL HEALTH CARE, (1998), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 33 - 40 | - WATANABE, T. ET AL., "Noncontact Method for Sleep Stage Estimation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (200410), vol. 51, no. 10 | - WHITNEY, C.W.; GOTTLIEB DJ; REDLINE S; NORMAN RG; DODGE RR; SHAHAR E; SUROVEC S; NIETO FJ, "Reliability of scoring respiratory disturbance indices and sleep staging", SLEEP, (19981102), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 749 - 757 | - YONGJOON, C. ET AL., "Air mattress sensor system with balancing tube for unconstrained measurement of respiration and heart beat movements", PHYSIOL. MEAS., (2005), vol. 26, pages 413 - 422 | US20070924459 | US20070782750 | US20080034165 | US20080113680 | US20080082510 |