EP2876087 - Latent heat vacuum evaporator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zenker, Wolfgang Sonnenpark 2 4810 Gmunden / AT | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/22] | Application number, filing date | 13193703.9 | 20.11.2013 | [2015/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2876087 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/04 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
B01D1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2015/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Unterdruck-Latentwärmeverdampfer | [2015/22] | English: | Latent heat vacuum evaporator | [2015/22] | French: | Evaporateur de chaleur latente à dépression | [2015/22] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 24.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 22.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 24.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 24.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5198076 (BORGREN PETER M [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 68; figure 1 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 8 *; | [X]US2008179175 (LEHOVEC KURT [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] *; | [X]US4584061 (SHELTON ROBERT E [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 21 - column 5, line 48; figures 1-6 *; | [X]DE1517385 (BURNETT AND ROLFE LTD) [X] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * * page 15, paragraph 1 - page 16, paragraph 1 *; | [X]US6833056 (KAMIYA ICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 37 - line 44 * * column 6, line 14 - column 10, line 32; figures 1-17 *; | [X]US2003057085 (AZIMI HOSSEIN [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0022] - [0034] *; | [X]US2003173204 (SANCHEZ GOMEZ GINES [ES]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0017] - [0025] *; | [X]DE2707715 (FRITZEN HELMUT ING GRAD) [X] 1-10 * page 6, paragraphs 2-3 * | by applicant | - K.-H GROTE; J. FELDHUSEN, DUBBEL Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau, SPRINGER- VERLAG |