EP2875917 - Hair cutting appliance and blade set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bennik, Jan P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Van der Scheer, Robbert P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Stapelbroek, Martijn P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Aitink, AJ P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
Hoexum, Everhard P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Uittenbroek, Arie Leendert, et al Koninklijke Philips N.V. P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13193969.6 | 22.11.2013 | [2015/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2875917 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/06 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
B26B19/06 (EP,US);
B26B19/046 (EP,US);
B26B19/3846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2015/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Haarschneidegerät und Klingensatz | [2015/22] | English: | Hair cutting appliance and blade set | [2015/22] | French: | Appareil de coupe de cheveux et ensemble de lames | [2015/22] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 26.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2266259 (SPECIALIFE IND LTD [HK]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2009126201 (MELTON SCOTT A [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2450161 (ROVCAL INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2013150412 |