EP2744128 - Receiving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuka, Takuya c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, 7-chome Nakagaito Daito-shi, Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/10] |
Former [2014/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13194219.5 | 25.11.2013 | [2014/25] | Priority number, date | JP20120272511 | 13.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012272511 | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2744128 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2744128 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B15/06, H04B1/00 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
H04B1/0057 (EP,US);
H04H40/90 (US);
H04B15/06 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04W72/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] |
Former [2014/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Empfangsvorrichtung | [2014/25] | English: | Receiving apparatus | [2014/25] | French: | Appareil de réception | [2014/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | ES | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | IT | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | LU | 25.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
ES | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006068708 (DESSERT DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0058]; figure 9 *[I] 2-6; | [XI]WO2008148125 (MICROTUNE TEXAS LP [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043]; figures 3,6 * [I] 2-6 | by applicant | JP2006253885 |