08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
06.11.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
28.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
05.12.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.10.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.10.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.07.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.06.2019 |
Change - German title |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
28.06.2019 |
Change - English title |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
28.06.2019 |
Change - French title |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
14.05.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.03.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.10.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.10.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2018 |
First examination report |
|
29.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
05.12.2014 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
04.12.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.06.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
02.05.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |