Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9174742 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2015 | B2 | US2014156116 | 05.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1261446 | 30.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014111438 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1261446 | 30.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103847971B | Global Dossier | 02.01.2018 | B | CN103847971 | 11.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1261446 | 30.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2738099 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2020 | B1 | EP2738099 | 04.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1261446 | 30.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102013030932 | 29.10.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR1261446 | 30.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2835451 | 30.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1261446 | 30.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2998873 | 14.10.2016 | B1 | FR2998873 | 06.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1261446 | 30.11.2012 |