EP2743035 - Multifunctional manual tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dab Pumps S.p.A. Via Marco Polo, 14 35035 Mestrino (Padova) / IT | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tazioli, Stefano Piazza Democrazia, 6 57016 ROSIGNANO MARITTIMO, Località Gabbro LI / IT | 02 /
Sinico, Francesco Via Circonvallazione, 61 36075 MONTECCHIO MAGGIORE VI / IT | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 13194716.0 | 27.11.2013 | [2014/25] | Priority number, date | IT2012PD00098U | 12.12.2012 Original published format: IT PD20120098 U | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2743035 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2743035 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B25F1/02, B25B13/48, B25F1/00 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
B25F1/003 (EP);
B25F1/02 (EP,US);
B25F1/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/25] | B25F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Multifunktionelles Handwerkzeug | [2014/25] | English: | Multifunctional manual tool | [2014/25] | French: | Outil manuel multifonction | [2014/25] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 22.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/08] | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2968980 (WALTER ZIEROLD) [X] 1,2 * columns 2,3; figure - * [Y] 3-6 [I] 7; | [X]US4467677 (GRIFFORD DANIEL W [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5086674 (HER JERN-SHONG [TW]) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [XY]US5272942 (HULL HAROLD L [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * columns 2,3; figure - * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US6374708 (KUNZ CHERYL [US]) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [Y]US2003110903 (CREEK JAMES M [US]) [Y] 3 * page 2; figure - *; | [A]DE202005002520U (RABE WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [A]US2005274233 (LIN CHORNG-JIANG [TW]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [XYI]US2006016298 (CHANG HSUEH C [TW]) [X] 1,4,5 * the whole document * [Y] 3,6 [I] 2,7; | [Y]US7096765 (DIGGLE III FREDERICK JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * column 2; figure - * |