EP2746233 - Broadening the rare earth ion emission bandwidth, increasing emission cross section, and/or shifting peak emission wavelength in ND-doped aluminate or silicate glasses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott Corporation 555 Taxter Road Elmsford, New York 10523 / US | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
George, Simi 38 Grandview Drive Pittston, PA Pennsylvania 18640 / US | 02 /
Carlie, Nathan 105 Glenview Ln Waverly, PA Pennsylvania 18411 / US | 03 /
Pucilowski, Sally 119 McAlpine Street Duryea, PA Pennsylvania 18642 / US | 04 /
Hayden, Joseph 107 Fox Run Circle Clarks Summit, PA Pennsylvania 18411 / US | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Tower 185 Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 35-37 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/34] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Westhafenplatz 1 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2014/26] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Westhafenplatz 1 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 13194859.8 | 28.11.2013 | [2014/26] | Priority number, date | US201213687476 | 28.11.2012 Original published format: US201213687476 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2746233 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2746233 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2746233 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C03C4/12, C03C3/093, C03C3/091, C03C3/089, C03C3/095, C03C3/062, C03C4/00 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
C03C3/062 (EP,RU,US);
C03C3/089 (RU,US);
C03C3/14 (KR);
H01S3/176 (US);
C03C3/064 (KR);
C03C3/066 (KR);
C03C3/091 (RU,US);
C03C3/093 (RU,US);
C03C3/095 (EP,RU,US);
C03C4/0071 (EP,US);
C03C4/12 (US);
C09K11/7758 (EP,US);
C09K11/7774 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H01S3/00 (KR);
H01S3/1631 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/26] | C03C3/062, C03C3/095, C03C4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2014/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Erweiterung der Ionenemissionsbandbreite seltener Erden, Erhöhung des Emissionsquerschnitts und/oder Verschiebung der Spitzenemissionswellenlänge in ND-dotierten Aluminat- oder Silkatgläsern | [2014/26] | English: | Broadening the rare earth ion emission bandwidth, increasing emission cross section, and/or shifting peak emission wavelength in ND-doped aluminate or silicate glasses | [2014/26] | French: | Élargissement de la largeur de bande d'émission d'ions de terres rares, augmentation d'une section transversale d'émission et/ou décalage de longueur d'onde d'émission de crête dans des verres de silicate ou aluminate dopés par du ND | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 16.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2013 | AL | 23.08.2017 | AT | 23.08.2017 | CY | 23.08.2017 | CZ | 23.08.2017 | DK | 23.08.2017 | EE | 23.08.2017 | ES | 23.08.2017 | FI | 23.08.2017 | HR | 23.08.2017 | IT | 23.08.2017 | LT | 23.08.2017 | LV | 23.08.2017 | MC | 23.08.2017 | MK | 23.08.2017 | NL | 23.08.2017 | PL | 23.08.2017 | PT | 23.08.2017 | RO | 23.08.2017 | RS | 23.08.2017 | SE | 23.08.2017 | SI | 23.08.2017 | SK | 23.08.2017 | SM | 23.08.2017 | TR | 23.08.2017 | BG | 23.11.2017 | NO | 23.11.2017 | GR | 24.11.2017 | IE | 28.11.2017 | LU | 28.11.2017 | MT | 28.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | IS | 23.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 28.11.2013 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
MK | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 28.11.2013 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
MK | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.11.2013 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
MK | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.11.2013 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.11.2013 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 23.08.2017 | |
NO | 23.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3469729 (GREKILA RICHARD B, et al); | [I]US3714059 (SHAW R, et al); | [I]US3717583 (SHAW R, et al); | by applicant | US4217382 | US5526369 |