12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
16.12.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
07.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
26.08.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
19.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
18.09.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
16.09.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.09.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.09.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.06.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.05.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
29.05.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
17.10.2014 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
17.10.2014 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
03.06.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
02.05.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |