Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9407029 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2016 | B2 | US2014199896 | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201300845 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL229777 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | GB201300845 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2757639 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | B1 | EP2757639 | 23.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201300845 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2836150 | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201300845 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2509924 | 23.07.2014 | A | GB201300845D0 | 06.03.2013 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201300845 | 17.01.2013 |