EP2881822 - Computer-implemented method and system for automatic monitoring and status detection of entire process stages in a process unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2015 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. Ross, Thomas Düsseldorfer Str. 53 B 51063 Köln / DE | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 13195897.7 | 05.12.2013 | [2015/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881822 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G05B19/418 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
G05B19/41885 (EP,KR,US);
G05B13/0265 (US);
G05B23/0216 (EP,KR,US);
G05B23/0254 (EP,KR,US);
G05B2219/24015 (EP,KR,US);
G05B2219/33037 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Computer-implementiertes Verfahren und System zur automatischen Überwachung und Statusermittlung ganzer Prozessabschnitte in einer Process Unit | [2015/24] | English: | Computer-implemented method and system for automatic monitoring and status detection of entire process stages in a process unit | [2015/24] | French: | Procédé implémenté par ordinateur et système de surveillance automatique et de détermination de l'état de l'intégralité des étapes de processus dans une unité de traitement | [2015/24] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2013 | Examination requested [2015/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0893746 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,4* column 2, line 3 - column 7, line 24 *; | [Y]DE102009025855 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1,4 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0089] *; | [XI]US2013024415 (HERZOG JAMES P [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0108] * [I] 2,3 | by applicant | - MÜHLENKAMP, S.; GEIPEL-KEM, A., "Plant Asset Management: In der Diagnose mechanischer Assets schlummert ungenutztes Potenzial", PROCESS, (2011), pages 36 - 38 | - "Neue Software zur Überwachung ''nicht intelligenter'' Anlagenteile", ROSS, T; OCHS, S.; FREY, C.W., Chemie Technik, (2011), pages 18 - 20 | - FREY, C. W., "Prozessdiagnose und Monitoring feldbusbasierter Automatisierungsanlagen mittels selbstorganisierender Karten und Watershed-Transformation", AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK, (2008), vol. 56, no. 7, pages 374 - 380 | - ROSS, T.; HEDLER, C. , S.; FREY, C.W, "Neue Softwarewerkzeug zur Überwachung ''nicht intelligenter'' Anlagenteile und Teilanlagen", AUTOMATION 2012 13. BRANCHEN- TREFF DER MESS-UND AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK. VDI-BERICHTE 2171, (2012), pages 231 - 235 |