Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH708956 | 31.08.2021 | B1 | CH708956 | 15.06.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP13196237 | 09.12.2013 | CH20332013 | 09.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9658601 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2017 | B2 | US2015160617 | 11.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13196237 | 09.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5981978B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2016 | B2 | JP2015114320 | 22.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13196237 | 09.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104698809B | Global Dossier | 27.07.2018 | B | CN104698809 | 10.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13196237 | 09.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2881806 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2019 | B1 | EP2881806 | 10.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13196237 | 09.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1211090 | 13.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13196237 | 09.12.2013 |