EP2881181 - Method for determining electrical parameters of a tuning unit for an ultrasonic transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elmos Semiconductor Aktiengesellschaft Heinrich-Hertz-Straße 1 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2016/11] |
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states ELMOS Semiconductor Aktiengesellschaft Heinrich-Hertz-Straße 1 44227 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [2015/24] | For all designated states ELMOS Semiconductor AG Heinrich-Hertz-Straße 1 44227 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spiegel, Egbert c/o ELMOS Semiconductor AG Heinrich-Hertz-Straße 1 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13196307.6 | 09.12.2013 | [2015/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881181 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/02, H04R3/04 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
B06B1/0215 (EP);
B06B2201/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung von elektrischen Parametern einer Abstimmeinheit für einen Ultraschallwandler | [2015/24] | English: | Method for determining electrical parameters of a tuning unit for an ultrasonic transducer | [2015/24] | French: | Procédé de détermination de paramètres électriques d'un syntoniseur pour convertisseur à ultrasons | [2015/24] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/33] | 06.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011261652 (HORSKY PAVEL [CZ], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * figure 6 *; | [Y]US2007121970 (MIYAZAKI SHINICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0147] * * figure 5a *; | [A]JP2001086587 (TOKIMEC INC) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * figures 2,4 *; | [A]US2007121969 (MAYAZAKI SHINICHI [JP]) [A] 1,8 * figure 7 * |