EP2884331 - Electro-optic modulator and method of fabricating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institute of Solid State Physics, University of Latvia Kengaraga iela 8 1063 Riga / LV | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nitiss, Edgars Zirnu iela 1 dz. 43 LV-1013 Riga / LV | 02 /
Rutkis, Martins "Salenieki" 57 LV-2118 Salaspils pagasts / LV | 03 /
Svilans, Mikelis Eizensteina iela 63 dz. 3 LV-1079 Riga / LV | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Koppel, Mart Enn KOPPEL patendibüroo OÜ Roseni 10-151 10111 Tallinn / EE | Application number, filing date | 13196563.4 | 10.12.2013 | [2015/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2884331 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/065 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
G02F1/065 (EP);
G02F1/3617 (EP);
G02F2201/066 (EP);
G02F2202/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrooptischer Modulator und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2015/25] | English: | Electro-optic modulator and method of fabricating same | [2015/25] | French: | Modulateur électro-optique et son procédé de fabrication | [2015/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2013 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 09.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2012103823 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,9-15 * abstract * [I] 5-8; | [A]EP0442796 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 5-8 * figures 3-20 *; | [A] - YOSHITO SHUTO ET AL, "ELECTROOPTIC LIGHT MODULATION AND SECOND-HARMONIC GENERATION IN NOVEL DIAZO-DYE-SUBSTITUTED POLED POLYMERS", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19911201), vol. 3, no. 11, doi:10.1109/68.97842, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 1003 - 1006, XP000232679 [A] 5-8 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.97842 | [A] - LIANG J ET AL, "THERMALLY STABLE CROSS-LINKED POLYMERS FOR ELECTRO-OPTIC APPLICATIONS", JOURNAL DE PHYSIQUE III, EDITIONS DE PHYSIQUE, PARIS, FR, (19941201), vol. 4, no. 12, doi:10.1051/JP3:1994289, ISSN 1155-4320, pages 2441 - 2450, XP000491704 [A] 5-8 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1051/jp3:1994289 |