EP2884684 - Method of wirelessly transmitting data according to a specific telegram packing and communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2015/25] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hulbert, Anthony Peter 109 Ethelburt Avenue Bassett Green, Southampton, Hampshire SO16 3DF / GB | [2015/25] | Application number, filing date | 13197226.7 | 13.12.2013 | [2015/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2884684 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/06, H04L5/00, H04L27/26 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
H04L5/1469 (EP,US);
H04L1/0668 (EP);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur drahtlosen Datenübertragung gemäß einer spezifischen Telegrammverpackung und Kommunikationssystem | [2015/25] | English: | Method of wirelessly transmitting data according to a specific telegram packing and communication system | [2015/25] | French: | Procédé de transmission sans fil de données selon un télégramme spécifique encapsulé et système de communication | [2015/25] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003002450 (JALALI AHMAD [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * figures 2,7,13,14 *; | [I]WO2008108710 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1-9* the whole document *; | [I]EP2071757 (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024]; figures 1,3A * |