Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014174621 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261740154 | 20.12.2012 | US201313792796 | 11.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014122032 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261740154 | 20.12.2012 | US201313792796 | 11.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103879241 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261740154 | 20.12.2012 | US201313792796 | 11.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2746074 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2015 | B1 | EP2746074 | 25.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261740154 | 20.12.2012 | US201313792796 | 11.03.2013 |