Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9893934 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2018 | B2 | US2016373296 | 22.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130054008 | 13.05.2013 | KR20120147724 | 17.12.2012 | US201615257299 | 06.09.2016 | US201314109312 | 17.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101833866B | Global Dossier | 16.04.2018 | B1 | KR20140079697 | 27.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20120147724 | 17.12.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013364730B | Global Dossier | 12.01.2017 | B2 | AU2013364730 | 14.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130054008 | 13.05.2013 | KR20120147724 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013KR11722 | 17.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2666636 | 11.09.2018 | C2 | RU2015129037 | 23.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130054008 | 13.05.2013 | KR20120147724 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013KR11722 | 17.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014098441 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130054008 | 13.05.2013 | KR20120147724 | 17.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9438442 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2016 | B2 | US2014173063 | 19.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130054008 | 13.05.2013 | KR20120147724 | 17.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6448901B | Global Dossier | 09.01.2019 | B2 | JP2014120177 | 30.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130054008 | 13.05.2013 | KR20120147724 | 17.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103873327B | Global Dossier | 09.11.2018 | B | CN103873327 | 18.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130054008 | 13.05.2013 | KR20120147724 | 17.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2744153 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2020 | B1 | EP2744153 | 08.10.2014 | A3 | EP2744153 | 18.06.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20130054008 | 13.05.2013 | KR20120147724 | 17.12.2012 |