EP2747247 - Stator and motor including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu Seoul, 04637 / KR | [2017/20] |
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 416, Hangang-daero Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woo, Shung Hun Seoul Square, 416, Hangang-daero, Jung-gu 100-174 Seoul / KR | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13197615.1 | 17.12.2013 | [2014/26] | Priority number, date | KR20120147957 | 18.12.2012 Original published format: KR 20120147957 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2747247 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2747247 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/18, H02K5/24 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H02K1/185 (EP,US);
H02K1/12 (KR);
H02K5/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stator und Motor damit | [2014/26] | English: | Stator and motor including the same | [2014/26] | French: | Stator et moteur comprenant ce dernier | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 28.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2012244647 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * figures 1,2 * [I] 5,12; | [X]JP2011080476 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * figure 1 * |