EP2716648 - ISOXAZOLIDINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/15] | Isoxazolidine derivatives | ||
[2017/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Palermo, 26/A 43100 Parma / IT | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghidini, Eleonora c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Palermo, 26/A 43100 PARMA / IT | 02 /
Rizzi, Andrea c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A Via Palermo, 26/A 43100 PARMA / IT | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2014/15] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 13197855.3 | 14.03.2012 | [2014/15] | Priority number, date | EP20110158230 | 15.03.2011 Original published format: EP 11158230 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2716648 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2716648 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07J71/00, A61K31/58, A61P5/44, A61P11/06, A61P37/08 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
C07J71/0068 (EP,US);
C07J71/00 (KR);
A61K31/58 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P5/44 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2014/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 30.09.2014 | ME | 30.09.2014 | Title | German: | ISOXAZOLIDIN-DERIVATE | [2017/03] | English: | ISOXAZOLIDINE DERIVATIVES | [2017/06] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'ISOXAZOLIDINE | [2017/03] |
Former [2014/16] | Isoxazolidin-Derivate | ||
Former [2014/15] | Isoxazolidine derivatives | ||
Former [2014/16] | Dérivés d'isoxazolidine | Examination procedure | 30.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 19.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12711601.0 / EP2686332 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20120711601) is 27.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2012 | AL | 14.06.2017 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | ES | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | MK | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | RS | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | SM | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | IE | 14.03.2018 | LU | 14.03.2018 | MT | 14.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.03.2012 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 14.03.2012 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
MT | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 14.03.2018 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3631033 (NATHANSOHN GIANGIACOMO, et al) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2006005611 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [I] 1-13 * the whole document * * in particular examples 1-3, 6 and 7 *; | [I]WO2009069032 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-13 * the whole document * * see examples 1-5 and in particular examples 6 and 7 *; | [I]WO2009108118 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [I] 1-13 * the whole document * * in particular examples 5,6,17-31, 36-44 and Table 1 *; | [XPI]WO2011029547 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [XP] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document * * in particular claim 1 * [I] 7; | [IP]WO2011095535 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [IP] 1-13 * the whole document ** in particular compounds 111-117 *; | [I] - GREEN M J ET AL, "Synthesis and topical antiinflammatory activity of some steroidal [16 alpha, 17 alpha-d]Isoxazolidines", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19821201), vol. 25, no. 12, doi:10.1021/JM00354A020, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1492 - 1495, XP002351702 [I] 1-13 * the whole document * * in particular abstract and table 1: examples 17, 19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00354a020 | [I] - GIRDHAR N K ET AL, "Regio- and stereoselective thermal cycloaddition of alpha-aryl-N-phenylnitrones to 16-dehydropregnenolone acetate: pi-facial selective addition of the minor rotamers of the nitrones", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000923), vol. 41, no. 39, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(00)01294-6, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 7551 - 7554, XP004217348 [I] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)01294-6 | by applicant | GB1578446 | WO2006005611 | WO2006074187 | WO2011029547 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1982), vol. 25, pages 1492 - 1495 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1995), pages 379 - 388 | - J. C. S. CHEM. COMM., (1985), pages 256 - 257 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2005), page 2834 | - J.MED. CHEM., (1982), vol. 25, pages 1492 - 1495 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1997), vol. 40, pages 1955 - 1968 | - CHEM.PHARM.BULL., (1998), vol. 46, pages 966 - 972 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1994), vol. 50, pages 13165 - 13172 | - MARCH'S, Advanced Organic Chemistry, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1999), vol. 1042 | - J.STEROID.BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 13, pages 311 - 322 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, pages 3717 - 3729 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1992), vol. 47, no. 17, pages 3557 - 3570 | - J.A.C.S., (2005), vol. 127, no. 29, page 10396 | - J.A.C.S., (2000), vol. 122, no. 18, page 4522 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1999), vol. 55, no. 41, page 12069 | - ORGANIC LETTERS, (2002), vol. 4, no. 15, page 2485 | - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1997), vol. 27, no. 20, pages 3497 - 3504 | - SYNTHESIS, (1984), vol. 11, pages 938 - 941 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2005), vol. 46, no. 35, pages 5913 - 5918 | - JOC, (1982), vol. 47, no. 7, page 1171 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2009), vol. 52, no. 19, page 5974 | - AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., (2000), vol. 162, pages 1455 - 1461 | - DRUG DEVEL.TECHNOL., (2006), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 263 - 272 | - J. NEUROIMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 150, pages 29 - 36 |