EP2747156 - High efficiency light emitting diode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. 1B-36, 727-5, Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Im, Chang Ik 1B-36, 727-5, Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu, Ansan-si 425-851 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Mi Hee 1B-36, 727-5, Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu, Ansan-si 425-851 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Ju Yong 1B-36, 727-5, Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu, Ansan-si 425-851 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Son, Sung Su 1B-36, 727-5, Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu, Ansan-si 425-851 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Kim, Chang Yeon 1B-36, 727-5, Wonsi-dong Danwon-gu, Ansan-si 425-851 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Stolmár & Partner Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13197996.5 | 18.12.2013 | [2014/26] | Priority number, date | KR20120148361 | 18.12.2012 Original published format: KR 20120148361 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2747156 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2747156 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/40, G02B1/00, // H01L33/38 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
G02B1/007 (EP,US);
H01L33/36 (KR);
H01L33/502 (US);
H01L33/04 (US);
H01L33/40 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0083 (EP,US);
H01L33/38 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/47] | H01L33/40, G02B1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2014/26] | H01L33/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] |
Former [2014/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hocheffiziente Leuchtdiode | [2014/26] | English: | High efficiency light emitting diode | [2014/26] | French: | Diode électroluminescente à haute efficacité | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 14.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/43] | 03.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008197369 (BATRES MAX [US], et al) [X] 12 * paragraphs [0039] , [0066] - [0068] * * figure 8 * [Y] 1-11; | [Y]US2011253975 (SHATALOV MAXIM S [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0047] * * figure 7 * |