EP2883768 - Coupling head unit for a commercial vehicle and method for coupling a supply line and a control line to a pneumatically operated brake system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmitz Cargobull AG Siemensstrasse 50 48341 Altenberge / DE | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruhkemper, Uwe Holtener Strasse 4 48565 Steinfurt / DE | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2015/25] | Application number, filing date | 13198503.8 | 19.12.2013 | [2015/25] | Priority number, date | DE201310114048 | 13.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013114048 | [2015/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2883768 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/04 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
B60T17/043 (EP);
B60T15/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kupplungskopfeinheit für ein Nutzfahrzeug und Verfahren zum Ankoppeln einer Versorgungsleitung und einer Steuerleitung an eine pneumatisch betriebene Bremsanlage | [2015/25] | English: | Coupling head unit for a commercial vehicle and method for coupling a supply line and a control line to a pneumatically operated brake system | [2015/25] | French: | Unité de tête d'accouplement pour un véhicule utilitaire et procédé d'accouplement d'une conduite d'alimentation et d'une ligne de commande à une installation de freinage pneumatique | [2015/25] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/26] | 26.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2426021 (HALDEX BRAKE PROD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10139748 (WABCO GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0030912 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20122549U (WABCO GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102011008271 |