Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12034737 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2024 | B2 | US2021336965 | 28.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261747095 | 28.12.2012 | US201916436708 | 10.06.2019 | US202117362850 | 29.06.2021 | US201313827839 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11057394 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2021 | B2 | US2019297090 | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261747095 | 28.12.2012 | US201916436708 | 10.06.2019 | US201313827839 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10320803 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2019 | B2 | US2014189067 | 03.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261747095 | 28.12.2012 | US201313827839 | 14.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2750062 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2021 | B1 | EP2750062 | 28.06.2017 | A3 | EP2750062 | 02.07.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261747095 | 28.12.2012 |