EP2804446 - Lighting control system, arrangement registering method, and recording medium storing arrangement registering program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 1-201-1 Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-8510 / JP | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishigaki, Hidenori c/o Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corportion 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho, Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Hisashi c/o Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho, Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Willquist, Sofia Ellinor Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2014/47] | Application number, filing date | 13199042.6 | 20.12.2013 | [2014/47] | Priority number, date | JP20130102558 | 14.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013102558 | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2804446 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
H05B47/11 (EP,US);
H05B47/175 (EP,US);
H05B47/199 (EP);
Y02B20/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchtungssteuerungssystem, Anordnungs-Registrierverfahren, und Aufzeichnungsmedium-Lagereinrichtungs-Registrierungsprogramm | [2014/47] | English: | Lighting control system, arrangement registering method, and recording medium storing arrangement registering program | [2014/47] | French: | Système de commande d'éclairage, procédé d'enregistrement de dispositif et support d'enregistrement stockant le programme d'enregistrement de dispositif | [2014/47] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 20.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008265799 (SIBERT W OLIN [US]) [A] 1-12* page 12, paragraphs 163-166; figure 1 *; | [XYI]US8207821 (ROBERGE BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9,11 * column 4, line 51 - column 6, line 61; figures 2, 30, 40 * * column 36, line 18 - column 38, line 43 * * column 48, line 22 - column 51, line 33 * * column 58, line 4 - column 59, line 3 * [Y] 2-4,10,12 [I] 7,8; | [A]US8248467 (GANICK AARON [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 1, lines 23-26; figures 1, 2, 5, 7, 9-11, 13-17 * * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 49 * * column 6, lines 60-65 *; | [Y]WO2013016439 (BYTELIGHT INC [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,10,12 * the whole document * |