EP2749332 - Providing a common virtual item repository in a virtual space; unlocking virtual items in a virtual space responsive to physical token detection; and facilitating customization of a virtual space based on accessible virtual items [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA 91521 / US | [2014/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vignocchi, John c/o Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA California 91521 / US | 02 /
Blackburn, John c/o Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA California 91521 / US | 03 /
Bunker, Jeffrey c/o Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA California 91521 / US | 04 /
Fisher, Marcus c/o Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA California 91521 / US | 05 /
Neber, Manfred c/o Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA California 91521 / US | 06 /
Leavitt, Troy c/o Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA California 91521 / US | 07 /
Lowe, Robert c/o Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA California 91521 / US | 08 /
Gosztyla, Jeffrey c/o Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA California 91521 / US | 09 /
Liddell, Chad c/o Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA California 91521 / US | 10 /
Bals, Jared c/o Disney Enterprises, Inc. 500 South Buena Vista Street Burbank, CA California 91521 / US | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Potter, Julian Mark WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Potter, Julian Mark WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13199483.2 | 23.12.2013 | [2014/27] | Priority number, date | US201261746052P | 26.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261746052 P | US201213727499 | 26.12.2012 Original published format: US201213727499 | US201213727503 | 26.12.2012 Original published format: US201213727503 | [2014/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2749332 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2749332 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/69, A63F13/30 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
A63F13/79 (EP,US);
A63F2300/575 (EP);
A63F2300/6018 (EP);
A63F2300/609 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2014/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bereitstellung eines gemeinsamen Repository für virtuelle Elemente in einem virtuellen Bereich, Freischaltung von virtuellen Elementen in einem virtuellen Bereich mit Reaktion auf die Detektion physikalischer Token sowie Bereitstellung der Anpassung eines virtuellen Bereichs auf Grundlage zugreifbarer virtueller Eemente | [2014/27] | English: | Providing a common virtual item repository in a virtual space; unlocking virtual items in a virtual space responsive to physical token detection; and facilitating customization of a virtual space based on accessible virtual items | [2014/27] | French: | Fournir un référentiel d'article virtuel commun dans un espace virtuel; déverrouillage d'articles virtuels dans un espace virtuel en réponse à une détection de jeton physique; faciliter la personnalisation d'un espace virtuel sur la base d'articles virtuels accessibles | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/27] | "Fournir un référentiel d'article virtuel commun dans un espace virtuel ; déverrouillage d'articles virtuels dans un espace virtuel en réponse à une détection de jeton physique ; faciliter la personnalisation d'un espace virtuel sur la base d'articles virtuels accessibles " | Examination procedure | 29.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 10.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/24] | 19.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/24] | 26.01.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP14190371.6 / EP2839868 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2011231781 (BETZLER BOAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0035] , [0040] , [0 44] , [0055] , [0 58] , [0061] * [Y] 12-15 [I] 4,5,11; | [YA]US2012015748 (OSADA TSUYOSHI [JP]) [Y] 12,15 * paragraphs [0103] , [0116]; figure 3 * [A] 11; | [YA]US2011294574 (YAMADA YOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0133] , [0142] * [A] 11; | [YA]US2011250954 (BRAUND STEPHEN [CA]) [Y] 14 * paragraphs [0018] , [0025] , [0027] * * paragraph [0050] * [A] 11 |