EP2782261 - Identifying line faults using near and far end errors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Lau, Chi-Fai, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Lau, Chi-Fai, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street, London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13250032.3 | 20.03.2013 | [2014/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2782261 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/46, H04M3/22 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
H04M3/2209 (EP,US);
H04B3/46 (EP,US);
H04M7/0024 (US);
H04M2201/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Identifizierung von Leitungsfehlern mittels Near-End- und Far-End-Fehler | [2014/39] | English: | Identifying line faults using near and far end errors | [2014/39] | French: | Identification de défauts de ligne à l'aide d'erreurs d'extrémité proche et distante | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2013 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2015/15] | 10.11.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2216972 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * | [XI] - C-Y YANG C ET AL, "Method and System of Performance Monitoring to Detect VDSL Service Degradation", CYBER-ENABLED DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING AND KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY (CYBERC), 2010 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101010), ISBN 978-1-4244-8434-8, pages 468 - 475, XP031786429 [X] 1 * abstract and introductory part;; figures 1,3 * [I] 2-5,7,8 | [A] - YEMINI S A ET AL, "High speed and robust event correlation", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (19960501), vol. 34, no. 5, doi:10.1109/35.492975, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 82 - 90, XP002557106 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.492975 |