EP2769779 - Facility and method for rolling a metal strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VAI Metals Technologies GmbH Turmstrasse 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charre, Francis 575, Chemin de la signière 42510 Balbiny / FR | 02 /
Faure, Jean-Paul 6, Les Rayes Vertes 95610 Eragny/Oise / FR | 03 /
Guillot, Yves Les Bruyères 42130 Trelins / FR | 04 /
Mauuary, Stanislas 11, rue Germaine Robin 42160 Saint-Cyprien / FR | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2014/35] | Application number, filing date | 13290036.6 | 22.02.2013 | [2014/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2769779 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B21B45/02 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
B21B45/0278 (EP,US);
B21B1/22 (US);
B21B45/0239 (US);
B21B45/0269 (US);
B21B1/28 (EP,US);
B21B2001/221 (EP,US);
B21B2015/0057 (EP,US);
B21B2275/06 (EP,US);
B21B2275/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anlage und Methode zum Walzen eines Metallstreifens | [2014/35] | English: | Facility and method for rolling a metal strip | [2014/35] | French: | Installation et méthode de laminage d'une bande métallique | [2014/35] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2013 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 28.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 09.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19843382 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 60; figure 1 *; | [X]EP2067541 (YIEH UNITED STEEL CORP [TW]) [X] 1-14* paragraph [0017]; figure 2 * | by applicant | GB1313577 |