EP2743420 - Soundproofing panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Placo SAS 34 Avenue Franklin Roosevelt 92150 Suresnes / FR | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hotchin, Glen 29 Flint Lane Barrow upon Soar, Loughborough LE12 8GS / GB | 02 /
Jones, Nicholas 14 Mere Road Waltham on the Wolds Melton Mowbray, Leicestershire LE14 4AL / GB | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | Pugsley, Victoria Antonietta Chapman IP Kings Park House 22 Kings Park Road Southampton SO15 2AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Pugsley, Victoria Antonietta Chapman Molony 18 Staple Gardens Winchester SO23 8SR / GB | Application number, filing date | 13290133.1 | 11.06.2013 | [2014/25] | Priority number, date | EP20120290435 | 12.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12290435 | [2014/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2743420 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/86, E04C2/04, E04C2/26, B32B5/02, B32B13/12, B32B13/14 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
B32B13/12 (EP,US);
E04B1/8409 (US);
B32B13/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
E04B1/86 (EP,US);
E04B2/7409 (EP,US);
E04B2/7457 (EP,US);
E04C2/26 (EP,US);
E04C2/46 (US);
E04C2/52 (US);
B32B2260/046 (US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,US);
B32B2307/102 (EP,US);
B32B2307/51 (EP,US);
B32B2607/00 (EP,US);
E04B2001/8461 (EP,US);
E04B2103/04 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lärmschutzplatte | [2014/25] | English: | Soundproofing panel | [2014/25] | French: | Panneau d'isolation phonique | [2014/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 14.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 14.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3350257 (HOURIGAN DANIEL P, et al) [X] 14 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 64; figure 1 * [A] 1-4,6-13; | [XA]GB1489825 (PROCTOR & CO A) [X] 14 * page 1, line 37 - page 2, line 22; figure 1 *[A] 1-4,6-13; | [XA]EP1251215 (G P GYPSUM CORP [US]) [X] 14 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-4,6-13; | [XI] - CSTB [FR], "Document Technique d'Application : KNAUF BA25-BA18", (20100728), URL: http://www.cstb.fr/pdf/atec/GS09-J/AJ090884_V1.pdf, (20131029), XP055085877 [X] 1,2,4,6,9,11,12,14 * pages 4,5, paragraph 4.5; tables 4,5 * * page 8, paragraph 10.4 * [I] 3,7,8,10,13 | by applicant | WO2008124672 |