EP2782281 - Data transmission using rateless coding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rouzbeh, Razavi c/o Alcatel-Lucent Ireland Ltd Blanchardstown Business Tech Park Snugborough Road Blanchardstown Dublin, 15 / IE | 02 /
Claussen, Holger c/o Alcatel-Lucent Ireland Ltd Blanchardstown Business Tech Park Snugborough Road Blanchardstown Dublin, 15 / IE | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Berthier, Karine, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Coghlan, Judith Elizabeth Kensy, et al Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome BA11 1BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 13305351.2 | 22.03.2013 | [2014/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2782281 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
H04L1/0057 (EP);
H04L1/1607 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2014/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Datenübertragung mit ratenloser Kodierung | [2014/39] | English: | Data transmission using rateless coding | [2014/39] | French: | Transmission de données en utilisant codage sans débit | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011246848 (YUE GUOSEN [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 7 - paragraph 10 * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 3, paragraph 43 * * page 6, paragraph 58 - paragraph 61 * | [X] - PRAKASH G ET AL, "Performance analysis of fountain codes with robust soliton distribution for erasure channels", 2011 IEEE RECENT ADVANCES IN INTELLIGENT COMPUTATIONAL SYSTEMS (RAICS 2011) IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (2011), ISBN 978-1-4244-9478-1, pages 671 - 674, XP002710780 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RAICS.2011.6069395 |