EP2662127 - Gas treatment method with catalytic hydrolysis of COS and/or CS2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXENS 89 Bd. Franklin Roosevelt B.P. 50802 92508 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states AXENS 89 Bd. Franklin Roosevelt B.P. 50802 92508 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states AXENS 89 Bd. Franklin Roosevelt B.P. 50802 92508 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roisin, Eric 8, Square Ronsard 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | 02 /
Lambert, Nicolas 8 Square Louis Blériot 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | 03 /
Loonis, Yann 22 rue Edgar Faure 75015 Paris / FR | [2014/07] |
Former [2013/46] | 01 /
Roisin, Eric 8, Square Ronsard 92500 RUEIL-MALMAISON / FR | ||
02 /
Lambert, Nicolas 8 Square Louis Blériot 92130 ISSY-LES-MOULINEAUX / FR | |||
03 /
Loonis, Yann 22 rue Edgar Faure 75015 PARIS / FR | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Nicolas A.J., et al IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Schmitt, Nicolas A.J., et al IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13305436.1 | 04.04.2013 | [2013/46] | Priority number, date | FR20120001362 | 10.05.2012 Original published format: FR 1201362 | [2013/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2662127 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2662127 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/86 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
B01D53/8603 (EP,BR,US);
B01J23/38 (BR,KR);
B01D53/86 (KR);
C07C5/02 (BR,US);
B01D53/48 (KR);
B01D53/864 (EP,BR,US);
B01J23/70 (BR,KR);
B01J23/883 (EP,US);
C07C7/14866 (BR,US);
C10K1/34 (EP,US);
C10K3/02 (EP,US);
B01D2251/202 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2045 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20707 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20769 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2092 (EP,US);
B01D2255/808 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/847 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Title | German: | Gasaufbereitungsverfahren mit katalytischer Hydrolyse von COS und/oder CS2 | [2014/32] | English: | Gas treatment method with catalytic hydrolysis of COS and/or CS2 | [2013/46] | French: | Procede de traitement de gaz avec hydrolyse catalytique de COS et/ou CS2 | [2014/46] |
Former [2013/46] | Gas- Aufbereitungverfahren mit katalytischer Hydrolyse von COS und/oder CS2 | ||
Former [2013/46] | Procédé de traitement de gaz avec hydrolyse catalytique de COS et/ou CS2 | Examination procedure | 13.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 15.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.01.2015 | AT | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | DK | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | FI | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | MK | 28.01.2015 | MT | 28.01.2015 | PL | 28.01.2015 | PT | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | RS | 28.01.2015 | SE | 28.01.2015 | SI | 28.01.2015 | SK | 28.01.2015 | SM | 28.01.2015 | TR | 28.01.2015 | IE | 04.04.2015 | LU | 04.04.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | NO | 28.04.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | BE | 30.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MK | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PT | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.04.2015 | ||
LU | 04.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MK | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.04.2015 | ||
LU | 04.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.04.2015 | ||
LU | 04.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.04.2015 | ||
LU | 04.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 04.04.2015 | ||
LU | 04.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 04.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 04.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 04.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 28.01.2015 | |
NO | 28.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006065459 (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0008] , [0018] , [0022] , [0024] , [0028] *; | [A]WO2009020473 (FLUOR TECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - page 3, line 8 * * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 19 *; | [A]WO2006055326 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0019] , [0021] , [0023] , [0030] - [0032] - [0038] - [0040] - [0043] , [0046] , [0049] , [0057] - [0059] *; | [A]GB563350 (GAS RES BOARD, et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 34 *; | [A]US3084023 (ANDERSEN HOLGER C, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 64 * | by applicant | US5466427 |