EP2680125 - Enhanced user interface to transfer media content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Briand, Hyacinthe 3600 Fillmore Street Apt. 202 CA 94115 SAN FRANCISCO / FR | 02 /
So, Bosco 216 N Lake Merced Hls SAN FRANCISCO, CA California CA94132 / US | 03 /
Vellaikal, Asha 2132 Valparaiso Ave Menlo Park SAN FRANCISCO, CA California CA 94025 / US | 04 /
Sidhom, Gabriel 4 Dickens Court MILL VALLEY, CA California CA 94941 / US | 05 /
Nahon, Georges 2 Townsend Street Building 1, Apartment 1005 SAN FRANCISCO, CA California CA 94107 / US | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 13305874.3 | 25.06.2013 | [2014/01] | Priority number, date | US201261665500P | 28.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261665500 P | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2680125 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2680125 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0486, H04L12/00, H04N21/414, H04N21/482, G06F3/0481 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
G06F3/0486 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04N21/4122 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/01] | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0486, G06F9/44, H04L12/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2014/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbesserte Benutzerschnittstelle zur Übertragung von Medieninhalt | [2014/01] | English: | Enhanced user interface to transfer media content | [2014/01] | French: | Interface utilisateur améliorée pour transférer un contenu multimédia | [2014/01] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 09.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.02.2018 | 30.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 22.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.11.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003222913 (MATTILA JOUKA [FI], et al) [X] 1,4-7,13 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0 14] - [0017] - [0 20] - [0025]; figures 1-5; claim 1; table 1 * [I] 2,3,8-12,14; | [A]US2009070840 (KAMIMAKI HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 9* paragraphs [0044] , [0 53]; figures 1-4 * |