EP2689834 - Continuous catalyst-regeneration reactor with box for mixing gas and distributing gas in the oxychlorination area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXENS 89 Bd. Franklin Roosevelt B.P. 50802 92508 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states AXENS 89 Bd. Franklin Roosevelt B.P. 50802 92508 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECOODT, Xavier 52 rue G. Péri 78420 CARRIERES S/SEINE / FR | 02 /
PLAIS, Cecile 0029 L-D LES ACACIAS 69420 LES HAIES / FR | 03 /
BAZER-BACHI, Frederic 0021 CHE DES LAIES 69540 IRIGNY / FR | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Nicolas A.J., et al IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Schmitt, Nicolas A.J., et al IFP Energies nouvelles Département Propriété Industrielle 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 13305936.0 | 01.07.2013 | [2014/05] | Priority number, date | FR20120002110 | 25.07.2012 Original published format: FR 1202110 | [2014/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2689834 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2689834 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/12, B01J23/96, // C10G35/12 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
B01J38/44 (EP,US);
B01J8/12 (BR);
B01J19/24 (KR);
B01J19/0053 (BR);
B01J23/42 (EP,US);
B01J23/96 (EP,US);
B01J27/13 (EP,US);
B01J27/32 (EP,US);
B01J38/02 (KR);
B01J6/00 (KR);
B01J8/125 (EP,BR,US);
C10G35/12 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00024 (EP,US);
B01J27/135 (EP,US);
C10G2400/02 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4973 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | Reaktor zur kontinuierlichen Regeneration eines Katalysators mit Gasmischungs- und Gasverteilungsgehäuse in der Oxychlorierungszone | [2014/05] | English: | Continuous catalyst-regeneration reactor with box for mixing gas and distributing gas in the oxychlorination area | [2014/05] | French: | Réacteur de régénération en continu de catalyseur avec caisson de mélange de gaz et de distribution de gaz dans la zone d'oxychloration. | [2014/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 11.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2013 | AL | 07.01.2015 | AT | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | ES | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | IT | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MK | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | RS | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | SM | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | NO | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | IE | 01.07.2015 | LU | 01.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 01.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PT | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.07.2015 | ||
LU | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 01.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.07.2015 | ||
LU | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.07.2013 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.07.2015 | ||
LU | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.07.2015 | ||
LU | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 01.07.2015 | ||
LU | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
LU | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 07.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0872277 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 4, line 12 - line 50; figure 3 *; | [AD]US7985381 (SUN BING [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 1, 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US3132092 (VAELL RAOUL P) [A] 1-11 * figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | US3761390 | US7985381 | FR2761907 |