Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9599736 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2017 | B2 | US2015098303 | 09.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13306385 | 07.10.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104512527B | Global Dossier | 15.06.2018 | B | CN104512527 | 15.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13306385 | 07.10.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2857869 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2023 | B1 | EP2857869 | 08.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13306385 | 07.10.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102014024961 | 01.02.2022 | B8 | BR102014024961 | 27.07.2021 | B1 | BR102014024961 | 06.10.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP13306385 | 07.10.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2865850 | 07.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13306385 | 07.10.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX351281 | 06.10.2017 | B | MX2014012074 | 29.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13306385 | 07.10.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2014140324 | 27.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | EP13306385 | 07.10.2013 |