EP2628583 - Natural coated handle and procedure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Igestek Increase & Win, S.L. Travesia Tivoli, 1, 4° izda. 48007 Bilbao Vizcaya / ES | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fernandez Fernandez, Ricardo Paseo Campo Volantin, 20, Depart.3 48007 Bilbao / ES | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Juncosa Miró, Jaime, et al Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Pau Claris, 108, 1r 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Juncosa Miro, Jaime, et al Torner, Juncosa i Associates, S.L. Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 669 bis, 1º, 2ª 08013 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 13380004.5 | 15.02.2013 | [2013/34] | Priority number, date | ES20120000131 | 15.02.2012 Original published format: ES 201200131 | [2013/34] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2628583 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B25G1/10, B29C45/16, B29L31/46 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
B29C45/14491 (EP);
B29C45/14008 (ES);
B25G1/10 (EP);
B29C2045/14352 (EP);
B29C2045/14877 (EP,ES);
B29C2045/14967 (ES);
B29C45/14344 (EP);
B29C45/1671 (EP);
B29K2021/003 (EP);
B29K2023/00 (EP);
B29K2075/00 (EP);
B29K2711/08 (EP);
B29L2031/463 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Natürlich beschichter Griff und Verfahren | [2013/34] | English: | Natural coated handle and procedure | [2013/34] | French: | Poignée revêtue naturelle et procédure | [2013/34] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/34] | 03.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH04232710 ; | [XI]JPH04220320 ; | [XI]JPH04232711 (HOSEI BRAKE IND) [X] 3 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * [I] 4-6; | [A]EP0464831 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3 * figures 1-6 * * abstract * * claims 1-10 * | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 40, Database accession no. 1992-327064, XP002697652 & JPH04232710 A 19920821 (HOSEI BRAKE KOGYO KK) [X] 3 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * [I] 4-6 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 38, Database accession no. 1992-313256, XP002698039 & JPH04220320 A 19920811 (HOSEI BRAKE KOGYO KK) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * [I] 4-6 |