EP2887580 - Method and system for modifying configuration parameters on a user equipment and an Auto Configuration Server-Gateway [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonica S.A. C/ Gran Via 28 28013 Madrid / ES | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Núñez Sanz, Manuel TELEFONICA, S.A. Gran Vía, 28 28013 Madrid / ES | 02 /
Castell Lucía, Juan Antonio TELEFONICA, S.A Gran Vía, 28 28013 Madrid / ES | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Carlos Hernando, Borja Garrigues IP, S.L.P. Hermosilla, 3 28001 Madrid / ES | [2015/26] | Application number, filing date | 13382548.9 | 23.12.2013 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2887580 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
H04L41/0873 (EP);
H04L41/0894 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Modifizierung von Konfigurationsparametern in einer Benutzervorrichtung und Selbstkonfigurationsserver-Gateway | [2015/26] | English: | Method and system for modifying configuration parameters on a user equipment and an Auto Configuration Server-Gateway | [2015/26] | French: | Procédé et système permettant de modifier des paramètres de configuration sur un équipement utilisateur et une configuration serveur-passerelle automatique | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2013 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2007268516 (BUGWADIA JAMSHEED [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0024] - [0030] - [0043] , [0044] , [0047] , [0052] , [0069] , [0072]; figure -; claim - * [A] 2-8,10-15; | [X]WO2012065101 (MADEY DANIEL A [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0047] - [0053]; claims 1-11 *; | [X] - "TR-134 Broadband Policy Control Framework (BPCF)", (20130101), URL: http://www.broadband-forum.org/technical/download/TR-134_Corrigendum-1.pdf, (20140505), XP055116285 [X] 1-5,8-15 * paragraphs [01.1] , [0005] , [0006] * | [A] - "TR-203 Interworking between Next Generation Fixed and 3GPP Wireless Networks", (20120801), URL: http://www.broadband-forum.org/technical/download/TR-203.pdf, (20140505), XP055116283 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] * | by applicant | CN102316602 | WO2013050808 | US2013103846 | WO2013064070 | WO2013082987 |