EP2889211 - Aircraft structure made of composite material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations S.L. Avda. John Lennon s/n Getafe 28906 Madrid / ES | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arévalo Rodríguez, M Elena Airbus Operations S.L. Avda John Lennon s/n 28906 Getafe / ES | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2015/27] | Elzaburu S.L.P. C/ Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 13382580.2 | 31.12.2013 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2889211 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2889211 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/06, B64C1/12 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
B64C1/12 (EP,US);
B32B37/02 (US);
B32B37/16 (US);
B32B38/00 (US);
B64C1/061 (EP,US);
B64C1/064 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0076 (US);
B32B2305/34 (US);
B32B2305/74 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2015/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Flugzeugstruktur aus Verbundmaterial | [2015/27] | English: | Aircraft structure made of composite material | [2015/27] | French: | Structure d'avion réalisée en matériau composite | [2015/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 18.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.12.2013 | AL | 24.10.2018 | AT | 24.10.2018 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | FI | 24.10.2018 | HR | 24.10.2018 | IT | 24.10.2018 | LT | 24.10.2018 | LV | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | MK | 24.10.2018 | NL | 24.10.2018 | PL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | RS | 24.10.2018 | SE | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | SM | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | IE | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | LU | 31.12.2018 | MT | 31.12.2018 | BG | 24.01.2019 | NO | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | IS | 24.02.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
IE | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
MT | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
IE | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
MT | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
IE | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
IE | 31.12.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
IE | 31.12.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
LU | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 24.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5223067 (HAMAMOTO KENJI [JP], et al); | [XYI]US5242523 (WILLDEN KURTIS S [US], et al); | [YA]US2008290214 (GUZMAN JUAN C [US], et al); | [YA]FR2977296 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS [FR]) | by applicant | US2012034416 |