|
13.07.2018 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
31 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.09.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.08.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Correction to A-publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2013 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2013 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |