24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
13.07.2018 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
28.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
13.12.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
20.07.2017 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
16.06.2017 |
Opposition filed |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
21.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
12.08.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
09.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.08.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.03.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
04.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
25.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
24.04.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
10.04.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.10.2014 |
Correction of patent application |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
24.10.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
14.10.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
12.09.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |