EP2801257 - Leavening preparation comprising a stabilized enzymatic mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Casteggio Lieviti S.r.l. Via Milano 42 27045 Casteggio (PV) / IT | [2014/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pasturenzi, Piero Via Deledda, 11 27045 Casteggio, Pavia / IT | 02 /
D'Incecco, Lorenzo Via del Circuito, 320 65100 Pescara / IT | [2014/46] | Representative(s) | Croce, Valeria, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2014/46] | Application number, filing date | 13425072.9 | 10.05.2013 | [2014/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2801257 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A21D2/18, A21D8/04, A21D10/00 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
A21D8/042 (EP);
A21D10/002 (EP);
A21D2/186 (EP);
A21D8/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stabilisierte Enzymmischung enhtaltende Treibzusammensetzung | [2014/46] | English: | Leavening preparation comprising a stabilized enzymatic mixture | [2014/46] | French: | Préparation levante comprenant un mélange enzymatique stabilisé | [2014/46] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2013 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 13.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 18.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005032260 (PANADORO GROUP AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,12,16,18 * the whole document * [I] 2,8,9,11,13,17,19; | [X]US2004033291 (BURGERMEISTER RENE [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,10,12,18 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2008133512 (CSM NEDERLAND BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,10,12,14,18 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2007117145 (CSM NEDERLAND BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,10,12,18 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2012049181 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,10,12,16,20 * the whole document * [I] 5,11; | [XI]US2004146601 (OSZLANYI ANTAL G [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10,12,13,15,16,20 * the whole document * [I] 11; | [X]WO9943213 (PURATOS NV [BE], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,12,14-18,20 * the whole document *; | [X]US2010310720 (MITCHELL TOM [US], et al) [X] 15,20 * the whole document *; | [X]US5716654 (GROENENDAAL JAN WILLEM [NL]) [X] 15,20 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2004028773 (STURKENBOOM MARCELLUS GERARDUS [NL], et al) [X] 20 * the whole document * [A] 8 |