EP2708433 - Station for a funicular assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innova Patent GmbH Rickenbacherstraße 8-10 6922 Wolfurt / AT | [2014/42] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Innova Patent GmbH Rickenbacherstrasse 8-10 6960 Wolfurt / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dür, Gerd Dorf 245 6858 Bildstein / AT | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Beer & Partner Patentanwälte KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [2014/12] | Application number, filing date | 13450015.6 | 18.04.2013 | [2014/12] | Priority number, date | AT20120001000 | 13.09.2012 Original published format: AT 10002012 | [2014/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2708433 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2708433 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B61B1/02, B61B12/02 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
B61B12/022 (EP,US);
B61B12/00 (AT);
B61B1/00 (KR);
B61B12/024 (US);
B61B10/02 (AT);
B61B11/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Title | German: | Station für eine Seilbahnanlage | [2014/12] | English: | Station for a funicular assembly | [2014/12] | French: | Station pour une installation de téléphérique | [2014/12] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 26.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2013 | AL | 15.10.2014 | BG | 15.10.2014 | CY | 15.10.2014 | DK | 15.10.2014 | EE | 15.10.2014 | LT | 15.10.2014 | LV | 15.10.2014 | MC | 15.10.2014 | MK | 15.10.2014 | MT | 15.10.2014 | NL | 15.10.2014 | RO | 15.10.2014 | RS | 15.10.2014 | SM | 15.10.2014 | GR | 16.01.2015 | IS | 15.02.2015 | PT | 16.02.2015 | IE | 18.04.2015 | LU | 18.04.2015 | BE | 30.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.04.2013 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MK | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 18.04.2013 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.04.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 15.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2007091205 (INNOVA PATENT GMBH) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]FR2935332 (POMAGALSKI SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [AD]EP2441638 (INNOVA PATENT GMBH [AT]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP2441638 |