EP2667148 - Method and device for measurement of linear dimension of an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polska Spólka Inzynierska DigiLab sp. z o.o. al. Jerozolimskie 200 02-486 Warszawa / PL | [2013/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makowski, Jerzy ul. Królewicza Jakuba 62 02-956 Warszawa / PL | 02 /
Orzechowski, Jan ul. Jaworzynska 7 m. 6 00-634 Warszawa / PL | 03 /
Wierzbicki, Michal ul. Malawskiego 5 m. 58 02-641 Warszawa / PL | 04 /
Jablonski, Ryszard ul. Mielczarskiego 1 m. 48 02-798 Warszawa / PL | [2013/48] | Application number, filing date | 13460033.7 | 27.05.2013 | [2013/48] | Priority number, date | PL20120399309 | 25.05.2012 Original published format: PL 39930912 | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2667148 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
G01B11/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung des Längenmasses eines Objekts | [2013/48] | English: | Method and device for measurement of linear dimension of an object | [2013/48] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de mesure de dimension linéaire d'un objet | [2013/48] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/22] | 30.04.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO8606159 | EP1619467 | EP0256539 | GB1399474 | US4172664 | US4112309 | GB1456286 |