Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] |
06.10.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.09.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.12.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
19.12.2014 | Change - classification | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
19.12.2014 | Change - classification | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
19.08.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
18.07.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |