EP2802592 - SUBSTITUTED ANNELLATED PYRIMIDINES AND TRIAZINES AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/47] | SUBSTITUTED ANNULATED PYRIMIDINES AND TRIAZINES, AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2019/26] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Str. 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLLMANN, Markus Rosmarinweg 28 50859 Köln / DE | 02 /
STASCH, Johannes-Peter Alfred-Nobel-Straße 109 42651 Solingen / DE | 03 /
REDLICH, Gorden Schadowstraße 50 44799 Bochum / DE | 04 /
GRIEBENOW, Nils Kurfürstenstr. 39 41541 Dormagen / DE | 05 /
LANG, Dieter Wimmersberger Str.60 42553 Velbert / DE | 06 /
WUNDER, Frank Schwarzer Weg 251 42117 Wuppertal / DE | 07 /
HÜBSCH, Walter Wildsteig 22 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 08 /
TERSTEEGEN, Adrian Rübezahlweg 8 42111 Wuppertal / DE | 09 /
VAKALOPOULOS, Alexandros Heinrich-Heine-Str. 79a 40721 Hilden / DE | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 13700288.7 | 10.01.2013 | WO2013EP50381 | Priority number, date | DE201210200349 | 11.01.2012 Original published format: DE102012200349 | [2014/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013104703 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2802592 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D519/00, A61K31/519, A61K31/53, A61P9/10, A61P9/12 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Extension states | BA | 11.08.2014 | ME | 11.08.2014 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE ANNELLIERTE PYRIMIDINE UND TRIAZINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2014/47] | English: | SUBSTITUTED ANNELLATED PYRIMIDINES AND TRIAZINES AND THEIR USE | [2019/47] | French: | PYRIMIDINES ET TRIAZINES ANNELÉES SUBSTITUÉES ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2014/47] |
Former [2014/47] | SUBSTITUTED ANNULATED PYRIMIDINES AND TRIAZINES, AND USE THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 26.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO03095451 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * claim - *; | [AD]WO2004009590 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * claim - *; | [AD]WO2011149921 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * examples 58-84,158,161-164,168-170,173,174,176-187,189; claims 1-8,13-20; tables 9,10,12,13 *; | [AD]WO2011147809 (BAYER PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * claim - *; | [XDP]WO2012004258 (BAYER PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [XDP] 1-7,9-15* examples 55A,56A,57A,58A,59A,73A,1-32; claim - *; | [XDP]WO2012143510 (BAYER IP GMBH [DE], et al) [XDP] 1-7,9-15 * examples 20A, 21A, 34A,1-4,9,10; claim - * | by applicant | US4833246 | WO0006568 | WO0006569 | WO03095451 | WO2004009590 | WO2005073234 | WO2006130673 | WO2007041052 | WO2010065275 | WO2011014992 | WO2011149921 | WO2011147809 | WO2012004259 | WO2012004258 | WO2012028647 | WO2012143510 | WO2012152629 | - WU ET AL., BLOOD, (1994), vol. 84, page 4226 | - MÜLSCH ET AL., BRIT. J. PHARMACOL., (1997), vol. 120, page 681 | - STASCH J.-P. ET AL., NAT. REV. DRUG DISC., (2006), vol. 5, pages 755 - 768 | - STASCH J.-P. ET AL., CHEMMEDCHEM, (2009), vol. 4, pages 853 - 865 | - STASCH J.-P. ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2011), vol. 123, pages 2263 - 2273 | - OUDOUT ET AL., EUR. UROL., (2011), vol. 60, pages 1020 - 1026 | - E. M. BECKER ET AL., BMC PHARMACOLOGY, (2001), vol. 1, no. 13 | - HASSAN J. ET AL., CHEM. REV., vol. 102, pages 1359 - 1469 | - HASSAN J. ET AL., CHEM. REV., (2002), vol. 102, pages 1359 - 1469 | - JUSTUS, LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, (1970), pages 99 - 107 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, no. 14, pages 3680 - 3691 | - KELLEY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1995), vol. 38, pages 3884 - 3888 | - TOCHE ET AL., J. HET. CHEM., (2010), vol. 47, pages 287 - 291 | - DALEY, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, pages 3680 - 3691 | - F. WUNDER ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2005), vol. 339, pages 104 - 112 | - KLAUS WITTE; KAI HU; JOHANNA SWIATEK; CLAUDIA MÜSSIG; GEORG ERTL; BJÖRN LEMMER, "Experimental heart failure in rats: effects on cardiovascular circadian rhythms and on myocardial ßadrenergic signaling", CARDIOVASC RES, (2000), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 203 - 405 | - KOZO OKAMOTO, "Spontaneous hypertension in rats", INT REV EXP PATHOL, (1969), vol. 7, pages 227 - 270 | - MAARTEN VAN DEN BUUSE, "Circadian Rhythms of Blood Pressure, Heart Rate, and Locomotor Activity in Spontaneously Hypertensive Rats as Measured With Radio-Telemetry", PHYSIOLOGY & BEHAVIOR, (1994), vol. 55, no. 4, pages 783 - 787 | - SHARKOVSKA Y; KALK P; LAWRENZ B; GODES M; HOFFMANN LS; WELLKISCH K; GESCHKA S; RELLE K; HOCHER B; STASCH JP, "NO-independent stimulation of soluble guanylate cyclase reduces target organ damage in low- and high-renin models of hypertension", J. HYPERTENSION, (2010), vol. 28, pages 1666 - 1675 |