|
10.10.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.10.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
02.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
25.03.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.03.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.03.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |