17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
12.10.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
28.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
23.05.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
27.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
03.11.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.06.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.03.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.02.2016 |
First examination report |
|
02.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.03.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
05.02.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2014 |
Change - inventor |
|
17.10.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
17.10.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
19.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|