06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
15.06.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
07.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
27.05.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
25.05.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.05.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.05.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.02.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.01.2016 |
Change - inventor |
|
22.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.12.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] |
25.12.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] |
24.03.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.03.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
13.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.10.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
17.10.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
22.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|